Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024