Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2204 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 16, 2024
Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis April 2, 2024
Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 15, 2024