Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2206 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024