House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House ED Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |