Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-5-2-0) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-2-0-0) | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to House TI Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |