Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-4-2-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |