House | 03/13/2024 | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiuccii, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2282. Passed by sv 30-29. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House motion to reconsider third reading | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-30-0-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to House COM Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |