Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024