Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2310 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis May 1, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024