Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-0-3-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-2-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
House RA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House RA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|