Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (35-21-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|