Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2373 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 7, 2024
Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024