Senate | 06/14/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 06/14/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-9-1-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Assigned to House TI Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |