Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2418 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024