Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2424 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024