Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate TTMC Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to House TI Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |