Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2453 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 13, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024