Senate | 06/14/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 06/14/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House NREW Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |