Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2518 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 3, 2024