Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2522 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 1, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024