Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2571 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 8, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024