LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2573
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona House Bill HB2573
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2024 Regular Session
Arizona House Bill HB2573
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 6, 2024
Bill
January 11, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 9, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 5, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 26, 2024
Analysis
June 18, 2024
Analysis
June 13, 2024
Analysis
May 9, 2024
Analysis
February 29, 2024
Analysis
February 5, 2024
Analysis
January 26, 2024
Analysis
January 22, 2024