House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-3-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-3-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to House ED Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |