House | 03/04/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |