Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2581 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis April 24, 2024
Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024