Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2582 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 11, 2024