Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024