Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024