Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2623 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis April 10, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024