Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2630 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024