Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 17, 2024
Analysis April 15, 2024
Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024