Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024