Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|