Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Chapter 187
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (57-0-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to House NREW Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|