Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-1-3-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |