Senate | 04/02/2024 | Chapter 74 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Governor Signed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2729 substitited for SB 1272. Motion carried. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-17-3-0) | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to House RA Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |