House | 03/12/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-3-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to House TI Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |