Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-18-0-0) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-2-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assigned to House ED Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |