Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2818 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis April 2, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024