Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2866 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 29, 2024
Bill February 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024