Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Chapter 44
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Senate FICO Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Assigned to House WM Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|