Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Chapter 222
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2024
|
Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2910 substituted for SB 1748. Motion carried.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (36-19-5-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (32-26-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-1-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-7-1-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|