Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024