06/12/2024 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |||
House | 06/12/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (0-0-0-) | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-1-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |