Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2037 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/31/2024

                    House Engrossed   victims of communism day           State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024           HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 2037                    A Concurrent Resolution   proclaiming november 7, 2024 as victims of communism day in Arizona.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

House Engrossed   victims of communism day
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 2037

House Engrossed

 

victims of communism day

 

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-sixth Legislature

Second Regular Session

2024

 

 

 

HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 2037

 

 

 

 

A Concurrent Resolution

 

proclaiming november 7, 2024 as victims of communism day in Arizona.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

  Whereas, more than 100 years have passed since the Bolshevik Revolution in Russia and the formation of the first communist government under Vladimir Lenin, leading to decades of oppression and violence under communist regimes throughout the world; and  Whereas, based on the economic philosophies of Karl Marx, communism has proven to be incompatible with the ideals of liberty, prosperity and dignity of human life and has given rise to such infamous totalitarian dictators as Vladimir Lenin, Joseph Stalin, Mao Zedong, Fidel Castro and Pol Pot; and  Whereas, communist regimes worldwide have killed more than 100 million people and subjected countless others to exploitation and unspeakable atrocities, with victims representing many different ethnicities, creeds and backgrounds; and  Whereas, through false promises of equality and liberation or through coercion, brutality and fear, communist regimes have systematically robbed their own citizens of the rights of freedom of worship, freedom of speech and freedom of association; and  Whereas, many victims of communism were persecuted as political prisoners for speaking out against these regimes, and others were killed in genocidal state-sponsored purges of undesirable groups; and  Whereas, in addition to violating basic human rights, communist regimes have suppressed intellectual freedom, cultural life and self-determination movements in more than 40 nations. Therefore Be it resolved by the House of Representatives of the State of Arizona, the Senate concurring:  1. That the Members of the Legislature proclaim November 7, 2024 as Victims of Communism Day in Arizona. 2. That the Members of the Legislature encourage the citizens and schools of this state to observe the day and to honor the millions of people around the world who have fallen victim to communist regimes through poverty, starvation, imprisonment, forced migration, death, violence and suppression of basic human rights.  

 Whereas, more than 100 years have passed since the Bolshevik Revolution in Russia and the formation of the first communist government under Vladimir Lenin, leading to decades of oppression and violence under communist regimes throughout the world; and

 Whereas, based on the economic philosophies of Karl Marx, communism has proven to be incompatible with the ideals of liberty, prosperity and dignity of human life and has given rise to such infamous totalitarian dictators as Vladimir Lenin, Joseph Stalin, Mao Zedong, Fidel Castro and Pol Pot; and

 Whereas, communist regimes worldwide have killed more than 100 million people and subjected countless others to exploitation and unspeakable atrocities, with victims representing many different ethnicities, creeds and backgrounds; and

 Whereas, through false promises of equality and liberation or through coercion, brutality and fear, communist regimes have systematically robbed their own citizens of the rights of freedom of worship, freedom of speech and freedom of association; and

 Whereas, many victims of communism were persecuted as political prisoners for speaking out against these regimes, and others were killed in genocidal state-sponsored purges of undesirable groups; and

 Whereas, in addition to violating basic human rights, communist regimes have suppressed intellectual freedom, cultural life and self-determination movements in more than 40 nations.

Therefore

Be it resolved by the House of Representatives of the State of Arizona, the Senate concurring:

 1. That the Members of the Legislature proclaim November 7, 2024 as Victims of Communism Day in Arizona.

2. That the Members of the Legislature encourage the citizens and schools of this state to observe the day and to honor the millions of people around the world who have fallen victim to communist regimes through poverty, starvation, imprisonment, forced migration, death, violence and suppression of basic human rights. 

       PASSED BY THE HOUSE FEBRUARY 13, 2024.   PASSED BY THE SENATE JUNE 12, 2024.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 12, 2024. 

 

 

 

PASSED BY THE HOUSE FEBRUARY 13, 2024.

 

PASSED BY THE SENATE JUNE 12, 2024.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 12, 2024.