Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024