Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HCR2049 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024