|
06/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-10-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Assigned to House NREW Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|