Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | House RA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Assigned to House RA Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time |