Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HJR2001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 12, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024